WV HB151 | 2019 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-23 - Approved by Governor 6/28/19 - Senate Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-23 - Approved by Governor 6/28/19 - Senate Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of supplemental appropriation bill is to supplement existing items of appropriation in the aforesaid account for the designated spending unit for expenditure during the fiscal year 2020.                                                                Â
Title
Making a supplementary appropriation to the Department of Arts, Culture and History, Division of Culture and History, Lottery Education Fund
Sponsors
Del. Roger Hanshaw [R] | Del. Tim Miley [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-24 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 83) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 83) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 82) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 865) (Y: 89 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 864) (Y: 87 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 83) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 82) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 865) (Y: 89 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 864) (Y: 87 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-23 | Senate | Approved by Governor 6/28/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-06-28 | House | Approved by Governor 6/28/19 |
2019-07-23 | Senate | To Governor 6/28/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-06-28 | House | To Governor 6/28/19 |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 83) |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 83) |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 82) |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Committee reference dispensed |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-06-19 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-06-19 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 865) |
2019-06-19 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 864) |
2019-06-19 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-06-19 | House | On 3rd reading with right to amend, Special Calendar |
2019-06-18 | House | Amendments pending |
2019-06-18 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-06-18 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-06-17 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-06-17 | House | Immediate consideration |
2019-06-17 | House | Do pass |
2019-06-17 | House | To House Finance |
2019-06-17 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-06-17 | House | To Finance |
2019-06-17 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1051 (Similar To) 2019-06-24 - To Rules