WV HB161 | 2019 | 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-24 - To Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-24 - To Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to remove or revise obsolete, outdated, antiquated, inoperative, surplus or superseded provisions of code related to the School Building Authority.
Title
Removing or revising obsolete, outdated, antiquated, inoperative, surplus or superseded provisions of code related to the School Building Authority
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 877) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-24 | Senate | To Education |
2019-06-24 | Senate | To Education |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-06-19 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-06-19 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 877) |
2019-06-19 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-06-19 | House | On 3rd reading with right to amend, Special Calendar |
2019-06-18 | House | Amendments pending |
2019-06-18 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-06-18 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-06-17 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-06-17 | House | Immediate consideration |
2019-06-17 | House | Do pass |
2019-06-17 | House | To House Select Committee on Education Reform A |
2019-06-17 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-06-17 | House | To Select Committee on Education Reform A |
2019-06-17 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 9D | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 9D | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 9D | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 9D | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 9D | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 9D | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 9D | 5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
18 | 9D | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 9D | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 9D | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 9D | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |