WV HB163 | 2019 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-24 - To Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this bill is to remove sections of the West Virginia Code, or portions of some sections, which contain antiquated, redundant, or outdated requirements for the administration of education in West Virginia.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Removing sections of code relating to administration of education

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-19 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 879) (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-24SenateTo Education
2019-06-24SenateTo Education
2019-06-24SenateIntroduced in Senate
2019-06-19HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-06-19HousePassed House (Roll No. 879)
2019-06-19HouseRead 3rd time
2019-06-19HouseOn 3rd reading with right to amend, Special Calendar
2019-06-18HouseAmendments pending
2019-06-18HouseRead 2nd time
2019-06-18HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2019-06-17HouseRead 1st time
2019-06-17HouseImmediate consideration
2019-06-17HouseDo pass
2019-06-17HouseTo House Select Committee on Education Reform A
2019-06-17HouseIntroduced in House
2019-06-17HouseTo Select Committee on Education Reform A
2019-06-17HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
18A13Repealed CodeCitation Text
18A420Repealed CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback