WV HB168 | 2019 | 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on June 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-22 - On 2nd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-22 - On 2nd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to create the West Virginia Equal Opportunity Education Scholarship program to provide tax credits for eligible contributions made to an authorized scholarship-granting organization, an educational improvement grant organization, public school district, and public school foundation that assists students in paying for education related expenses.
Title
Establishing the West Virginia Equal Opportunity Education Scholarship program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - House - Shall bill be taken up for immediate consideration and read a first time? (Roll No. 831) (Y: 56 N: 40 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - House - Shall bill be referred to Finance? (Roll No. 821) (Y: 72 N: 24 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - House - Shall bill be referred to Finance? (Roll No. 821) (Y: 72 N: 24 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-22 | House | On 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2019-06-19 | House | Placed on House Calendar |
2019-06-19 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-06-18 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-06-18 | House | Shall bill be taken up for immediate consideration and read a first time? (Roll No. 831) |
2019-06-18 | House | Do pass |
2019-06-17 | House | To House Finance |
2019-06-17 | House | Do pass, but first to Finance |
2019-06-17 | House | Shall bill be referred to Finance? (Roll No. 821) |
2019-06-17 | House | To House Select Committee on Education Reform B |
2019-06-17 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-06-17 | House | To Select Committee on Education Reform B |
2019-06-17 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 28 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 28 | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 28 | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 28 | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 28 | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 28 | 14 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 28 | 15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 28 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 28 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 28 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 28 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 28 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 28 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 28 | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 28 | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |