WV HB2009 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 98, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 98, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to provide a framework to support a network of not more than 20 schools that are interested in transitioning to an educational system wherein students’ progress when they have mastered the subject matter content, rather when they have received at least the minimum grade at the end of a required period of course time. The bill sets forth and identifies those systems  are generally referred to as mastery-based, proficiency-based or competency-based systems and are intended to both reduce the skill deficits that students accumulate when they progress through the subject matter without mastering it and empower students to move on to more challenging material more quickly once they have achieved mastery. The bill provides such a framework by creating a special category for Innovation in Education/Mastery-Based grants under the Innovation in Education program. The bill provides that an application for initial consideration is open to all public schools and the applicants are then narrowed down to not more than 20 determined to be ready for such an undertaking. The bill provides that this multistep process includes additional capacity-building for this initial network of not more than 20 schools and allows an opt out, prior to the requirement for submission of an Innovation in Education/Mastery-Based implementation plan and operational agreement with the applicable county board of education. The bill provides that schools awarded an implementation grant are required to continue participation in the “incubator” network with the other grantee schools during implementation.
Title
Creating a new category of Innovation in Education grant program
Sponsors
Del. Danny Hamrick [R] | Del. Mark Dean [R] | Del. Chris Phillips [R] | Del. Scott Cadle [R] |
Del. Eric Porterfield [R] | Del. Stephen Wilson [R] | Del. Roland Jennings [R] | Del. Roy Cooper [R] |
Del. Paul Espinosa [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate receded and passed (Roll No. 392) (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 373) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 23) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 373) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 23) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Chapter 98, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/27/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-27 | House | Approved by Governor 3/27/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/27/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/25/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-25 | House | To Governor 3/25/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/25/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate receded and passed (Roll No. 392) |
2019-03-07 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-06 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-06 | House | House refused to concur; requested Senate to recede (Voice) |
2019-03-06 | House | House received Senate message |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 373) |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-06 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Finance Committee amendments adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Education Committee amendments withdrawn by unanimous consent |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-05 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-03-04 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-03-02 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendments |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Motion |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendments, but first to Finance |
2019-01-28 | Senate | To Education |
2019-01-28 | Senate | To Education |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-01-28 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-01-25 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-01-25 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 23) |
2019-01-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-01-25 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-01-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-01-24 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-01-23 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-01-23 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-01-22 | House | Do pass |
2019-01-15 | House | To House Education |
2019-01-15 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-01-15 | House | To Education |
2019-01-14 | House | Filed for introduction |