WV HB2036 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 261, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 261, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
This purpose of this bill is to permit vehicles displaying disabled veterans special registration plates to park in places where persons with mobility impairments may park.
Title
Permitting vehicles displaying disabled veterans' special registration plates to park in places where persons with mobility impairments may park
Sponsors
Del. Roy Cooper [R] | Del. Jeffrey Pack [R] | Del. Ruth Rowan [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-25 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 237) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 30) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 30) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Chapter 261, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/9/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/9/19 |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/9/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-04 | Senate | To Governor 3/4/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-05 | House | To Governor 3/4/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-04 | House | To Governor 3/4/19 |
2019-02-26 | House | House received Senate message |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 237) |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Reported by clerk |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Laid over on 3rd reading 2/23/19 |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-23 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-22 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-02-21 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2019-01-29 | Senate | To Military |
2019-01-29 | Senate | To Military |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-01-29 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-01-28 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-01-28 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 30) |
2019-01-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-01-28 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-01-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-01-25 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-01-24 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-01-24 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-01-23 | House | 2nd reference dispensed |
2019-01-23 | House | Do pass |
2019-01-09 | House | To House Veterans' Affairs and Homeland Security |
2019-01-09 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-01-09 | House | To Veterans' Affairs and Homeland Security then Judiciary |
2019-01-09 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17C | 13 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |