WV HB2079 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Vetoed on March 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Vetoed by Governor 3/27/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on March 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Vetoed by Governor 3/27/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to remove the maximum number of grower, processor and dispensary permits. The bill removes the requirements that licenses be limited in regions of the state.
Title
Removing certain limitations on medical cannabis grower, processor and dispensary licenses
Sponsors
Del. Mike Pushkin [D] | Del. Jordan Hill [R] | Del. Cindy Lavender-Bowe [D] | Del. Mick Bates [D] |
Del. Cody Thompson [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-09 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 725) (Y: 80 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 724) (Y: 75 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 463) (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 463) (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 462) (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Baldwin Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 461) (Y: 16 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-27 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 358) (Y: 88 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 357) (Y: 84 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - Amendment adopted (Roll No 355) (Y: 63 N: 35 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - motion to have 2nd reference dispensed with adopted (Roll No. 244) (Y: 79 N: 15 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 724) (Y: 75 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 463) (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 463) (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 462) (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Baldwin Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 461) (Y: 16 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-27 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 358) (Y: 88 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 357) (Y: 84 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - Amendment adopted (Roll No 355) (Y: 63 N: 35 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - motion to have 2nd reference dispensed with adopted (Roll No. 244) (Y: 79 N: 15 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | House | Vetoed by Governor 3/27/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | Vetoed by Governor 3/27/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor 3/27/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-25 | House | To Governor 3/25/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/25/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-09 | House | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-09 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-09 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 725) |
2019-03-09 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 724) |
2019-03-09 | House | House received Senate message |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 463) |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 463) |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 462) |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Committee amendment as amended adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Baldwin Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 461) |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Takubo Amendment to committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Committee Amendment Reported |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-08 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2019-02-28 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-02-28 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-28 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-02-27 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-02-27 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 358) |
2019-02-27 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-02-27 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 357) |
2019-02-27 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-27 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-26 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-02-26 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-02-26 | House | Amendment adopted (Roll No 355) |
2019-02-26 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-26 | House | Placed at foot of bills on second reading |
2019-02-26 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-26 | House | Placed on Special Calender |
2019-02-26 | House | From Special Calendar, 2nd reading, placed on House Calendar |
2019-02-25 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-22 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-02-22 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-21 | House | 2nd reference dispensed |
2019-02-21 | House | motion to have 2nd reference dispensed with adopted (Roll No. 244) |
2019-02-21 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2019-01-09 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2019-01-09 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-01-09 | House | To Health and Human Resources then Judiciary |
2019-01-09 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16A | 10 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16A | 11 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16A | 15 | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16A | 16 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16A | 2 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16A | 4 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16A | 6 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16A | 6 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16A | 7 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16A | 8 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16A | 9 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16A | 9 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16A | 9 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |