WV HB2083 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 58, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 58, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to facilitate a released inmate’s reintegration into society, by requiring the Commissioner of the Division of Motor Vehicles and Commissioner of Corrections, to provide an identification card for inmates who do not have a West Virginia identification card or driver’s license.
Title
Providing an identification card for released inmates who do not have a West Virginia identification card or driver’s license
Sponsors
Del. Mike Pushkin [D] | Del. John Shott [R] | Del. Tim Miley [D] | Del. Chad Lovejoy [D] |
Del. Rodney Miller [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-09 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 729) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 376) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 39) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 376) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 39) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Chapter 58, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-03-26 | House | Approved by Governor 3/26/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/26/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/26/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-25 | House | To Governor 3/25/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/25/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-09 | House | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-09 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-09 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 729) |
2019-03-09 | House | House received Senate message |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Trump Title amendment adopted |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Judiciary Title amendment withdrawn by unanimous consent |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 376) |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-06 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Committee amendment as amended adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Amendment to committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Committee Amendment Reported |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-05 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Rules on 2nd reading |
2019-02-20 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-02-19 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2019-01-30 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-01-30 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-01-30 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-01-29 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-01-29 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-01-29 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 39) |
2019-01-29 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-01-29 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-01-28 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-01-28 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-01-25 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-01-25 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-01-24 | House | 2nd reference dispensed |
2019-01-24 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2019-01-09 | House | To House Judiciary |
2019-01-09 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-01-09 | House | To Judiciary then Finance |
2019-01-09 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17B | 2 | 1c | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 1 | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |