WV HB2164 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2164
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to clarify that appeals to the Supreme Court are a matter of right and that every party has an opportunity to be heard and to obtain a written decision on the merits of the appeal.
Title
Clarifying that appeals to the Supreme Court are a matter of right
Sponsors
Del. John Shott [R] | Del. Joseph Canestraro [D] | Del. Barbara Fleischauer [D] | Del. Eric Porterfield [R] |
Del. Stephen Wilson [R] | Del. Tom Fast [R] | Del. Moore Capito [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-04 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 81) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-05 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2020-02-05 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-02-04 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-02-04 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 81) |
2020-02-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-04 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-03 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-01-31 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-01-31 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2020-01-30 | House | Do pass |
2020-01-08 | House | To House Judiciary |
2020-01-08 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-01-08 | House | To Judiciary |
2020-01-08 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2164 (Carry Over) 2019-01-17 - To Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
58 | 5 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |