WV HB2179 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-09 - On 1st reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-09 - On 1st reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to require notification to voters at polling places in primary elections that they may request and use a ballot for one of the major political parties if the voter is not affiliated with any party or if the voter is registered with a party that does not have candidates on a ballot for that polling area. This codifies the process that has been in place allowing nonmembers of a political party to request that party’s partisan ballot at a primary election.
Title
Allowing nonmembers of a political party to request that party’s partisan ballot at a primary election
Sponsors
Del. Gary Howell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-09 | House | On 1st reading, House Calendar |
2019-02-26 | House | From Special Calendar, 1st reading, placed on House Calendar |
2019-02-25 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-22 | House | Postponed on 1st reading, Special Calendar, until 2/25/19 |
2019-02-22 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-21 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2019-01-09 | House | To House Judiciary |
2019-01-09 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-01-09 | House | To Judiciary |
2019-01-09 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3 | 1 | 35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 1 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 5 | 14a | New Code | See Bill Text |