WV HB2180 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 153, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 153, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to authorize the issuance of special "In God We Trust" motor vehicle registration plates.
Title
Authorizing the issuance of special "In God We Trust" motor vehicle registration plates
Sponsors
Del. Ralph Rodighiero [D] | Del. Justin Marcum [D] | Del. Jeff Eldridge [D] | Sen. Rupert Phillips [R] |
Del. Zachery Maynard [R] | Del. Steve Westfall [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-04 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 337) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 325) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 153) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 325) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 153) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | House | Chapter 153, Acts, Regular Session, 2017 |
2017-04-11 | House | Approved by Governor 4/11/17 |
2017-04-09 | House | Approved by Governor 4/11/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/11/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-04-08 | House | To Governor 4/6/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-06 | House | To Governor 4/6/17 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | To Governor 4/6/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-04-05 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-04-04 | House | Completed legislative action |
2017-04-04 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-04-04 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 337) |
2017-04-04 | House | House received Senate message |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 325) |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-03 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2017-04-01 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2017-04-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-01 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2017-03-31 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2017-03-25 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2017-03-25 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2017-03-25 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2017-03-25 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-03-24 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-03-24 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 153) |
2017-03-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-24 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-23 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-22 | House | Read 1st time |
2017-03-22 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-21 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2017-03-08 | House | To House Judiciary |
2017-03-08 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2017-02-08 | House | To House Roads and Transportation |
2017-02-08 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-02-08 | House | To Roads and Transportation then Judiciary |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB459 (Similar To) 2017-03-08 - To Finance
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17A | 3 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17A | 3 | 14a | New Code | See Bill Text |