WV HB2190 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-22 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-22 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to modify misdemeanor bail requirements.
Title
Modifying bail requirements
Sponsors
Del. John Shott [R] | Del. Barbara Fleischauer [D] | Del. David Kelly [R] | Del. Stephen Wilson [R] |
Del. Mike Pushkin [D] | Del. Shawn Fluharty [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-21 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 9) (Y: 91 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-22 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-01-22 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-01-22 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-01-21 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-01-21 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-01-21 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 9) |
2019-01-21 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-01-21 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-01-18 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-01-18 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-01-18 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-01-17 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-01-17 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-01-16 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2019-01-09 | House | To House Judiciary |
2019-01-09 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-01-09 | House | To Judiciary |
2019-01-09 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
62 | 1C | 1a | Amended Code | Citation Text |