WV HB2193 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 107, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 107, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to provide a specific escheat of United States savings bonds.
Title
Providing a specific escheat of US savings bonds
Sponsors
Del. John Shott [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-09 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 527) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 499) (Y: 72 N: 22 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 296) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 295) (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 15) (Y: 72 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 499) (Y: 72 N: 22 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 296) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 295) (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 15) (Y: 72 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Chapter 107, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-03-26 | House | Approved by Governor 3/26/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/26/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/26/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/25/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-25 | House | To Governor 3/25/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/25/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | House | House received Senate message |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 527) |
2019-03-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-06 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-06 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-03-06 | House | House concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 499) |
2019-03-06 | House | House received Senate message |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 296) |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 295) |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-01 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-02-28 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment |
2019-01-24 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-01-24 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-01-24 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-01-23 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-01-23 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 15) |
2019-01-23 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-01-23 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-01-22 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-01-22 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-01-22 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-01-21 | House | Postponed on 2nd reading, Special Calendar, until 1/22/19 |
2019-01-21 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-01-18 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-01-18 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-01-17 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2019-01-09 | House | To House Judiciary |
2019-01-09 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-01-09 | House | To Judiciary |
2019-01-09 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
36 | 8 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
36 | 8 | 2a | New Code | See Bill Text |