WV HB2209 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 192, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 192, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to allow military veterans who meet certain qualifications to qualify for examination for license as an emergency medical technician.
Title
Allowing military veterans who meet certain qualifications to qualify for examination for license as an emergency medical technician
Sponsors
Del. Gary Howell [R] | Del. John Shott [R] | Del. Geoff Foster [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-08 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 429) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 31) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 31) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Chapter 192, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-25 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/21/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-21 | House | To Governor 3/21/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/21/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-08 | House | House received Senate message |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 429) |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-08 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-07 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-03-06 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2019-01-29 | Senate | To Military |
2019-01-29 | Senate | To Military |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-01-29 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-01-28 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-01-28 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 31) |
2019-01-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-01-28 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-01-25 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-01-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-01-25 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-01-24 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-01-24 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-01-23 | House | 2nd reference dispensed |
2019-01-23 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2019-01-10 | House | To House Veterans' Affairs and Homeland Security |
2019-01-10 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-01-10 | House | To Veterans' Affairs and Homeland Security then Health and Human Resources |
2019-01-10 | House | Filed for introduction |