WV HB2229 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-26 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-26 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to add additional violations of law and remove exceptions for certain lesser included crimes, that could cause the forfeiture of a participant’s retirement plan.
Title
Adding violations of law upon which a public servant’s retirement plan may be forfeited
Sponsors
Del. John Shott [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-25 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 281) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-26 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-02-26 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-26 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-02-25 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-02-25 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-02-25 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 281) |
2019-02-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-25 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-22 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-02-22 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-22 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-21 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-02-21 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-20 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2019-02-14 | House | To House Judiciary |
2019-02-14 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2019-01-10 | House | To House Pensions and Retirement |
2019-01-10 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-01-10 | House | To Pensions and Retirement then Judiciary |
2019-01-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 10A | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |