WV HB2307 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 193, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 193, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to remove requirements to take an examination for a license to practice in this state, to create a provisional license to practice in this state by an applicant with an expired license from another state; and, direct the board to set the applicable fees for a provisional license.
Title
Relating to creating a provisional license for practicing barbering and cosmetology
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-11 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 112) (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 8) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 8) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Chapter 193, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-02-20 | House | Approved by Governor 2/19/19 - House Journal |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Approved by Governor 2/19/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-02-19 | House | Approved by Governor 2/19/19 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | To Governor 2/14/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-02-14 | House | To Governor 2/14/19 |
2019-02-18 | House | To Governor 2/14/19 - House Journal |
2019-02-12 | House | House received Senate message |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 112) |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-11 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-08 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-02-07 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2019-01-21 | Senate | To Finance |
2019-01-21 | Senate | To Finance |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-01-21 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-01-18 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-01-18 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 8) |
2019-01-18 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-01-18 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-01-17 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-01-17 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-01-16 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-01-16 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-01-15 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2019-01-11 | House | To House Government Organization |
2019-01-11 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-01-11 | House | To Government Organization |
2019-01-11 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 27 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |