WV HB2321 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2321
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - To Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - To Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to provide workers’ compensation to first responders diagnosed with Post-Traumatic Stress Disorder by a psychiatrist from an event that occurred during their employment.
Title
Allowing workers’ compensation benefits for first responders diagnosed with post-traumatic stress disorder
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-21 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 271) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | Senate | To Finance |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Finance |
2020-02-24 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2020-02-24 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources then Finance |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-02-21 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-02-21 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 271) |
2020-02-21 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-21 | House | On 3rd reading with right to amend, Special Calendar |
2020-02-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-20 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-19 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-02-19 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-18 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2020-01-24 | House | To House Judiciary |
2020-01-24 | House | Do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2020-01-17 | House | To House Political Subdivisions |
2020-01-17 | House | Do pass, but first to Political Subdivisions |
2020-01-08 | House | To House Fire Departments and Emergency Medical Services |
2020-01-08 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-01-08 | House | To Fire Departments and Emergency Medical Services then Judiciary |
2020-01-08 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2321 (Carry Over) 2019-01-30 - To House Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
23 | 4 | 1f | Amended Code | Citation Text |