WV HB2324 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 194, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 194, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to authorize the West Virginia Acupuncture Board to issue certificates for performing auricular acudetox therapy.
Title
Authorizing the acupuncture board to issue certificates to perform auricular acudetox therapy
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-21 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 247) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 189) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 56) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 189) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 56) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Chapter 194, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-03-01 | House | Approved by Governor 3/1/19 |
2019-03-02 | House | Approved by Governor 3/1/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-02 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/1/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-02-26 | House | To Governor 2/26/19 |
2019-02-27 | House | To Governor 2/26/19 - House Journal |
2019-02-26 | Senate | To Governor 2/26/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-02-22 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-02-21 | House | Completed legislative action |
2019-02-21 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-02-21 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 247) |
2019-02-21 | House | House received Senate message |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 189) |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-21 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Reported by clerk |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Laid over on 2nd reading 2/19/19 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-19 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-02-18 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment |
2019-02-01 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2019-02-01 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-01 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-01-31 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-01-31 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 56) |
2019-01-31 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-01-31 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-01-30 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-01-30 | House | Amendment rejected (Voice vote) |
2019-01-30 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-01-30 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-01-29 | House | Postponed on 2nd reading, Special Calendar, until 1/30/19 |
2019-01-29 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-01-28 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-01-28 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-01-25 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2019-01-18 | House | To House Government Organization |
2019-01-18 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Government Organization |
2019-01-11 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2019-01-11 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-01-11 | House | To Health and Human Resources then Government Organization |
2019-01-11 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 36 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 36 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 36 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 36 | 18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 36 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 36 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 36 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |