WV HB2346 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-25 - To Government Organization
Pending: Senate Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-25 - To Government Organization
Pending: Senate Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to change the licensing requirement for certain casino employees from a licensure to a registration.
Title
Changing the licensing requirement for certain casino employees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-24 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 17) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-25 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2019-01-25 | Senate | To Government Organization then Finance |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-01-25 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-01-24 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-01-24 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 17) |
2019-01-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-01-24 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-01-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-01-23 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-01-22 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-01-22 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-01-21 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2019-01-11 | House | To House Government Organization |
2019-01-11 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-01-11 | House | To Government Organization |
2019-01-11 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29 | 22C | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 22C | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 22C | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 22C | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 22C | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 22C | 18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 22C | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 22C | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 22C | 29 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 22C | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 22C | 31 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 22C | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 22C | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 25 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 25 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 25 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 25 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 25 | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 25 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 25 | 18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 25 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 25 | 22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 25 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 25 | 27 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 25 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 25 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |