WV HB2359 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 173, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this bill is to exempt commercial motor vehicle operators employed with a farm related service industry from the commercial driver’s license requirements for a limited time period.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to exemptions to the commercial driver's license requirements

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 343) (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 418) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-02 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 321) (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 172) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-11HouseChapter 173, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
2019-03-19HouseApproved by Governor 3/19/19
2019-03-09HouseApproved by Governor 3/19/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09SenateApproved by Governor 3/19/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-09HouseTo Governor 3/9/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09SenateTo Governor 3/9/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-09HouseTo Governor 3/9/19
2019-03-05HouseHouse received Senate message
2019-03-05SenateCompleted legislative action
2019-03-05SenateCommunicated to House
2019-03-05SenateSenate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 343)
2019-03-05SenateHouse Message received
2019-03-04HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-03-04HouseTitle amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2019-03-04HouseHouse concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 418)
2019-03-04HouseHouse received Senate message
2019-03-02SenateSenate requests House to concur
2019-03-02SenatePassed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 321)
2019-03-02SenateRead 3rd time
2019-03-02SenateOn 3rd reading
2019-03-01SenateCommittee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2019-03-01SenateRead 2nd time
2019-03-01SenateOn 2nd reading
2019-02-28SenateRead 1st time
2019-02-28SenateOn 1st reading
2019-02-27SenateReported do pass, with amendment and title amendment
2019-02-15SenateTo Transportation and Infrastructure
2019-02-15SenateTo Transportation and Infrastructure
2019-02-15SenateIntroduced in Senate
2019-02-15SenateHouse Message received
2019-02-14HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-02-14HousePassed House (Roll No. 172)
2019-02-14HouseRead 3rd time
2019-02-14HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2019-02-13HouseRead 2nd time
2019-02-13HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2019-02-12HouseRead 1st time
2019-02-12HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2019-02-11HouseBy substitute, do pass
2019-01-31HouseTo House Government Organization
2019-01-31HouseWith amendment, do pass, but first to Government Organization
2019-01-14HouseTo House Technology and Infrastructure
2019-01-14HouseIntroduced in House
2019-01-14HouseTo Technology and Infrastructure then Government Organization
2019-01-14HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
17E18Amended CodeCitation Text
17E18aNew CodeSee Bill Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback