WV HB2407 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-31 - To Health and Human Resources
Pending: Senate Health and Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-31 - To Health and Human Resources
Pending: Senate Health and Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to rewrite the article on registered professional nurses. The bill prohibits the practice of nursing without a license. The bill defines terms. The bill renames the board. The bill provides for board composition and qualifications. The bill sets forth the powers and duties of the board. The bill clarifies rule-making authority. The bill continues a special revenue account. The bill establishes license and permit requirements. The bill establishes qualifications for licensure. The bill codifies a scope of practice. The bill creates a temporary permit. The bill provides for reciprocal licensure. The bill establishes renewal requirements. The bill provides for exemptions from licensure. The bill creates a special volunteer license. The bill continues a Joint Advisory Council. The bill provides the council’s composition. The bill provides council members’ terms. The bill provides powers of the council. The bill provides duties of the council. The bill sets forth limitations of the article. The bill permits the board to file an injunction. The bill sets forth grounds for disciplinary actions. The bill allows for specific disciplinary actions. The bill provides procedures for investigation of complaints. The bill provides for judicial review and appeals of decisions. The bill sets forth hearing and notice requirements. The bill provides for civil causes of action. The bill provides criminal offenses are to be reported to law enforcement. The bill provides a period of transition. The bill eliminates the Board of Examiners for licensed practical nurses. The bill repeals expired authority. The bill updates references. §30-7-1a, §30-7-6a, §30-7-6b, §30-7-8a, §30-7-11a, §30-7-15a, §30-7-15b, §30-7-15c, §30-7-15d, §30-7-15e, §30-7E-1, §30-7E-2, and §30-7E-3 are repealed. §30-7-1, §30-7-2, §30-7-3, §30-7-4, §30-7-5, §30-7-6, §30-7-7, §30-7-8, §30-7-9, §30-7-10, §30-7-11, §30-7-12, §30-7-13, §30-7-14, §30-7-15, §30-7-16, §30-7-18, §30-7-19, and §30-7-20 have been completely rewritten; therefore they have been completely underscored.
Title
Relating to registered professional nurses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-30 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 44) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-31 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2019-01-31 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-01-31 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-01-30 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-01-30 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 44) |
2019-01-30 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-01-30 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-01-29 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-01-29 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-01-29 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-01-29 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-01-28 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-01-28 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-01-25 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2019-01-15 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2019-01-15 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-01-15 | House | To Health and Human Resources |
2019-01-15 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 5B | 19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 7 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 7 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 7 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 7 | 11a | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
30 | 7 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 7 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 7 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 7 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 7 | 15a | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
30 | 7 | 15b | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
30 | 7 | 15c | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
30 | 7 | 15d | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
30 | 7 | 15e | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
30 | 7 | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 7 | 17 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 7 | 18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 7 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 7 | 1a | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
30 | 7 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 7 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 7 | 21 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 7 | 22 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 7 | 23 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 7 | 24 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 7 | 25 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 7 | 26 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 7 | 27 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 7 | 28 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 7 | 29 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 7 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 7 | 30 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 7 | 31 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 7 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 7 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 7 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 7 | 6a | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
30 | 7 | 6b | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
30 | 7 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 7 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 7 | 8a | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
30 | 7 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 7E | 1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
30 | 7E | 2 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
30 | 7E | 3 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |