WV HB2423 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-24 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-24 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to prohibit certain sex offenders from being in a supervisory position over children.
Title
Prohibiting certain sex offenders from being in a supervisory position over children
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-23 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 16) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-24 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-01-24 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-01-24 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-01-23 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-01-23 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 16) |
2019-01-23 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-01-23 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-01-22 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-01-22 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-01-21 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-01-21 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-01-18 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2019-01-15 | House | To House Judiciary |
2019-01-15 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-01-15 | House | To Judiciary |
2019-01-15 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
62 | 12 | 26 | Amended Code | Citation Text |