WV HB2441 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-09 - On 2nd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-09 - On 2nd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to remove certain requirements relating to wages for construction of public improvements.
Title
Removing certain requirements related to wages for construction of public improvements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-09 | House | On 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2019-02-26 | House | From Special Calendar, 2nd reading, placed on House Calendar |
2019-02-25 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-22 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-02-22 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-21 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2019-02-06 | House | To House Judiciary |
2019-02-06 | House | Do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2019-01-15 | House | To House Industry and Labor |
2019-01-15 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-01-15 | House | To Industry and Labor then Judiciary |
2019-01-15 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
21 | 1C | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |