WV HB2462 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 59, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 59, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to authorize the Commissioner of the Division of Corrections and Rehabilitation to authorize correctional employees to carry firearms and to establish certification and training requirements.
Title
Issuing a certificate to correctional employees to carry firearms
Sponsors
Del. Ray Hollen [R] | Del. Joseph Canestraro [D] | Del. David Kelly [R] | Del. Geoff Foster [R] |
Del. Tom Fast [R] | Del. Jason Harshbarger [R] | Del. John Mandt [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-11 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 115) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 86) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 22) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 86) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 22) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Chapter 59, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-02-20 | House | Approved by Governor 2/19/19 - House Journal |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Approved by Governor 2/19/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-02-19 | House | Approved by Governor 2/19/19 |
2019-02-15 | House | To Governor 2/14/19 - House Journal |
2019-02-14 | House | To Governor 2/14/19 |
2019-02-15 | Senate | To Governor 2/14/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-02-12 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-02-11 | House | Completed legislative action |
2019-02-11 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-02-11 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 115) |
2019-02-11 | House | House received Senate message |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 86) |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-06 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Reported by clerk |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Laid over on 2nd reading 2/4/19 |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Laid over on 2nd reading 2/1/19 |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-01 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-01-31 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2019-01-25 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-01-25 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-01-25 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-01-24 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-01-24 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-01-24 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 22) |
2019-01-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-01-24 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-01-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-01-23 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-01-22 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-01-22 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-01-21 | House | Do pass |
2019-01-16 | House | To House Judiciary |
2019-01-16 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-01-16 | House | To Judiciary |
2019-01-16 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB337 (Similar To) 2019-01-16 - To Government Organization
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15A | 3 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |