WV HB2472 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-18 - To Transportation and Infrastructure
Pending: Senate Transportation and Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-18 - To Transportation and Infrastructure
Pending: Senate Transportation and Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to provide a special license plate for pollinators. The bill also sets a fee.
Title
Providing a special license plate for pollinators
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-15 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 184) (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-18 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2019-02-18 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-18 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-02-15 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-02-15 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 184) |
2019-02-15 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-15 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-14 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-02-14 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-14 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-13 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-02-13 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-12 | House | 2nd reference dispensed |
2019-02-12 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance |
2019-01-17 | House | To House Technology and Infrastructure |
2019-01-17 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-01-17 | House | To Technology and Infrastructure then Finance |
2019-01-17 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17A | 3 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |