WV HB2510 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 124, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this bill is to require the Legislative Auditor to conduct review of the fee structure of a specific board of examination or registration when its special fund exceeds twice its annual budget or $10,000, whichever is greater. It also requires the Legislative Auditor to report to the Joint Standing Committee on Government Organization.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to special funds of boards of examination or registration

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-01 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 300) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 299) (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 46) (Y: 88 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-11HouseChapter 124, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
2019-03-26HouseApproved by Governor 3/26/19
2019-03-09HouseApproved by Governor 3/26/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09SenateApproved by Governor 3/26/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-08SenateTo Governor 3/8/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-08HouseTo Governor 3/8/19
2019-03-08HouseTo Governor 3/8/19 - House Journal
2019-03-02HouseHouse received Senate message
2019-03-01SenateCompleted legislative action
2019-03-01SenateCommunicated to House
2019-03-01SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 300)
2019-03-01SenateRead 3rd time
2019-03-01SenateConstitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 299)
2019-03-01SenateRead 2nd time
2019-03-01SenateOn 2nd reading
2019-02-28SenateRead 1st time
2019-02-28SenateOn 1st reading
2019-02-27SenateReported do pass
2019-01-31SenateTo Government Organization
2019-01-31SenateTo Government Organization
2019-01-31SenateIntroduced in Senate
2019-01-31SenateHouse Message received
2019-01-30HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-01-30HousePassed House (Roll No. 46)
2019-01-30HouseRead 3rd time
2019-01-30HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2019-01-29HouseRead 2nd time
2019-01-29HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2019-01-28HouseRead 1st time
2019-01-28HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2019-01-25HouseDo pass
2019-01-18HouseTo House Government Organization
2019-01-18HouseIntroduced in House
2019-01-18HouseTo Government Organization
2019-01-18HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
30110Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback