WV HB2514 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Chapter 190, Acts, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Chapter 190, Acts, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to is to lower the total amount of tax credits available in a given fiscal year.
Title
Lowering the total amount of tax credits available under the Film Industry Investment Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-13 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 407) (Y: 91 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 15) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-22 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 57) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 49) (Y: 16 N: 78 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-21 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 48) (Y: 26 N: 69 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-12 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 15) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-22 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 57) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 49) (Y: 16 N: 78 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-21 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 48) (Y: 26 N: 69 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-15 | House | Chapter 190, Acts, 2013 |
2013-04-17 | House | Approved by Governor 4/30/13 - House Journal |
2013-04-30 | House | Approved by Governor 4/30/13 |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/30/13 - Senate Journal |
2013-04-17 | House | To Governor 4/29/13 - House Journal |
2013-04-29 | House | To Governor 4/29/13 |
2013-04-17 | Senate | To Governor 4/29/13 - Senate Journal |
2013-04-13 | Senate | House Message received |
2013-04-13 | House | Completed legislative action |
2013-04-13 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2013-04-13 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 407) |
2013-04-13 | House | House received Senate message |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 15) |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-12 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-11 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2013-04-10 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2013-03-25 | Senate | To Finance |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2013-03-25 | Senate | House Message received |
2013-03-22 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2013-03-22 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 57) |
2013-03-22 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-03-22 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2013-03-21 | House | Amendment rejected (Roll No. 49) |
2013-03-21 | House | Amendment rejected (Roll No. 48) |
2013-03-21 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-03-21 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2013-03-20 | House | Read 1st time |
2013-03-20 | House | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar |
2013-03-19 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2013-02-15 | House | To House Finance |
2013-02-15 | House | Introduced in House |
2013-02-15 | House | To Finance |
2013-02-15 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB182 (Same As) 2013-03-14 - To Finance
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 13X | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |