WV HB2514 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-01-30 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this bill is to allow pawn brokers to reveal whether any property has been sold or pledged to the broker.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permitting pawn brokers to disclose whether any specific property has been sold or pledged

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-29 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 42) (Y: 91 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-30SenateTo Judiciary
2019-01-30SenateTo Judiciary
2019-01-30SenateIntroduced in Senate
2019-01-30SenateHouse Message received
2019-01-29HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-01-29HousePassed House (Roll No. 42)
2019-01-29HouseRead 3rd time
2019-01-29HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2019-01-28HouseRead 2nd time
2019-01-28HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2019-01-25HouseRead 1st time
2019-01-25HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2019-01-24HouseDo pass
2019-01-18HouseTo House Government Organization
2019-01-18HouseIntroduced in House
2019-01-18HouseTo Government Organization
2019-01-18HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
47262Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback