WV HB2515 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 251, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 251, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to exempt the sale and installation of mobility enhancing equipment and the sale and installation of repair or replacement parts of mobility enhancing equipment from the sales and use tax and to establish the definition of mobility enhancing equipment in this section.
Title
Exempting the sale and installation of mobility enhancing equipment from the sales and use tax
Sponsors
Del. Jim Butler [R] | Del. Scott Cadle [R] | Del. Stephen Wilson [R] | Del. Joe Ellington [R] |
Del. John Shott [R] | Del. Gary Howell [R] | Del. John Hardy [R] | Del. Larry Kump [R] |
Del. Jeffrey Pack [R] | Del. Erikka Storch [R] | Del. Tom Fast [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-06 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 377) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 225) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 225) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Chapter 251, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-25 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/18/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-18 | House | To Governor 3/18/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/18/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-07 | House | House received Senate message |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 377) |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-06 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-05 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2019-02-22 | Senate | To Finance |
2019-02-22 | Senate | To Finance |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-22 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-02-21 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-02-21 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-02-21 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 225) |
2019-02-21 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-21 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-20 | House | Amendment ruled not germane |
2019-02-20 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2019-02-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-20 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-19 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-02-19 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-18 | House | With title amendment, do pass |
2019-02-01 | House | To House Finance |
2019-02-01 | House | Do pass, but first to Finance |
2019-01-18 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2019-01-18 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-01-18 | House | To Health and Human Resources then Finance |
2019-01-18 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 15 | 9i | Amended Code | Citation Text |