WV HB2527 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2527
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to require that any sentence for violation of this statute be for a determinate period.
Title
Relating to forgery and other crimes concerning lottery tickets
Sponsors
Del. Brandon Steele [R] | Del. Jeffrey Pack [R] | Del. John Mandt [R] | Del. Joe Jeffries [R] |
Del. Kayla Kessinger [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-10 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 125) (Y: 88 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2020-02-11 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-02-10 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-02-10 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 125) |
2020-02-10 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-10 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-07 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-06 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-02-06 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-05 | House | Do pass |
2020-01-08 | House | To House Judiciary |
2020-01-08 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-01-08 | House | To Judiciary |
2020-01-08 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2527 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - To Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29 | 22 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |