WV HB2528 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2528
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-08 - Tabled on 3rd reading, Special Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-08 - Tabled on 3rd reading, Special Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to authorize the Commissioner of Agriculture to employ a general counsel and any other such personnel necessary to perform the duties of the office. This bill is recommended by the Agriculture and Rural Development Committee for introduction and passage during the 2019 Regular Session of the Legislature.
Title
Relating to employees of the Commissioner of Agriculture
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-08 | House | Tabled on 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-08 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-07 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-06 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-02-06 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-05 | House | Do pass |
2019-01-30 | House | To House Government Organization |
2019-01-30 | House | Do pass, but first to Government Organization |
2019-01-18 | House | To House Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2019-01-18 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-01-18 | House | To Agriculture and Natural Resources then Government Organization |
2019-01-18 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2528 (Carry Over) 2019-02-08 - Tabled on 3rd reading, Special Calendar
SB324 (Similar To) 2019-04-16 - Chapter 5, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
HB2624 (Similar To) 2019-01-24 - To House Agriculture and Natural Resources
SB324 (Similar To) 2019-04-16 - Chapter 5, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
HB2624 (Similar To) 2019-01-24 - To House Agriculture and Natural Resources
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 1 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |