WV HB2532 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-23 - To Transportation and Infrastructure
Pending: Senate Transportation and Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-23 - To Transportation and Infrastructure
Pending: Senate Transportation and Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to allow persons renewing their driver’s license or vehicle registration to make donations to the West Virginia 4 H foundation, the West Virginia Farm Bureau Foundation, and the West Virginia Future Farmers of America Educational Foundation in increments of $3, $5, or $10.
Title
Allowing certain donations by persons renewing their driver’s license or vehicle registration
Sponsors
Del. Roy Cooper [R] | Del. Scott Cadle [R] | Del. William Hartman [D] | Del. David Pethtel [D] |
Del. Eric Porterfield [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-22 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 260) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-23 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2019-02-23 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure then Finance |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-23 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-02-22 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-02-22 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 260) |
2019-02-22 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-22 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-21 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-21 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-21 | House | Placed on Special Calender |
2019-02-21 | House | On 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2019-02-20 | House | Placed on House Calender |
2019-02-20 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-19 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-02-19 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-18 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2019-01-30 | House | To House Finance |
2019-01-30 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance |
2019-01-21 | House | To House Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2019-01-21 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-01-21 | House | To Agriculture and Natural Resources then Finance |
2019-01-21 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17A | 2 | 12a | Amended Code | Citation Text |