WV HB2535 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2535
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-27 - To Government Organization
Pending: Senate Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-27 - To Government Organization
Pending: Senate Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to clarify the handling of purchases by the Division of Corrections and Rehabilitation.
Title
Relating to purchasing exemptions and procedures
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 314) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-27 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2019-02-27 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-27 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-02-26 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-02-26 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 314) |
2019-02-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-26 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-25 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-22 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-02-22 | House | Immediate consideration |
2019-02-22 | House | Do pass |
2019-02-15 | House | To House Government Organization |
2019-02-15 | House | Do pass, but first to Government Organization |
2019-01-21 | House | To House Veterans' Affairs and Homeland Security |
2019-01-21 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-01-21 | House | To Veterans' Affairs and Homeland Security then Government Organization |
2019-01-21 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2535 (Carry Over) 2019-02-27 - To Government Organization
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15A | 3 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |