WV HB2542 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2542
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-20 - To Government Organization
Pending: Senate Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-20 - To Government Organization
Pending: Senate Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to amend ยง24-6-5 by permitting the director of a county or municipality emergency telephone system to negotiate contracts for emergency mobile-phones in the county in the event landlines are unavailable.
Title
Permitting directors of county emergency phone systems to obtain mobile-phone emergency lines
Sponsors
Del. Gary Howell [R] | Del. Jeffrey Pack [R] | Del. Danny Hamrick [R] | Del. Roger Hanshaw [R] |
Del. Amy Summers [R] | Del. Evan Worrell [R] | Del. Mark Dean [R] | Del. Tom Fast [R] |
Del. John Paul Hott [R] | Del. Ray Hollen [R] | Del. Erikka Storch [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-19 - House - Effective July 1, 2019 (Roll No. 207) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 206) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 206) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-20 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2019-02-20 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-20 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-02-19 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-02-19 | House | Effective July 1, 2019 (Roll No. 207) |
2019-02-19 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 206) |
2019-02-19 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-19 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-18 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-18 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-15 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-02-15 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-14 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2019-01-30 | House | To House Government Organization |
2019-01-30 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Government Organization |
2019-01-21 | House | To House Political Subdivisions |
2019-01-21 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-01-21 | House | To Political Subdivisions then Government Organization |
2019-01-21 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2542 (Carry Over) 2019-02-20 - To Government Organization
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24 | 6 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |