WV HB2559 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-31 - To Government Organization
Pending: Senate Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-31 - To Government Organization
Pending: Senate Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to require a special report from the Division of Personnel to the Legislature by September 30 of 2019, regarding classification and compensation section activities, a report on administrative appeals of actions by the division and a report on the specific nature of intervention by the division in grievance and settlement activities.
Title
Requiring a special report by the Division of Personnel
Sponsors
Del. Gary Howell [R] | Del. Jeffrey Pack [R] | Del. Danny Hamrick [R] | Del. Evan Worrell [R] |
Del. Mark Dean [R] | Del. Tom Fast [R] | Del. John Paul Hott [R] | Del. Ray Hollen [R] |
Del. Erikka Storch [R] | Del. Joe Ellington [R] | Del. Jim Butler [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-30 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 50) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-31 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2019-01-31 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-01-31 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-01-30 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-01-30 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 50) |
2019-01-30 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-01-30 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-01-29 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-01-29 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-01-28 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-01-28 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-01-25 | House | Do pass |
2019-01-21 | House | To House Government Organization |
2019-01-21 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-01-21 | House | To Government Organization |
2019-01-21 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29 | 6 | 7a | Amended Code | Citation Text |