WV HB2607 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 216, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 216, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to update references to the secretary and bureau within the agency responsible for regulating nursing homes. This bill also updates the reference to the code of state rules for contested cases, updates the due process procedure, and makes technical cleanup.
Title
Relating to the licensure of nursing homes
Sponsors
Del. Jordan Hill [R] | Del. Margaret Staggers [D] | Del. Gary Howell [R] | Del. Ruth Rowan [R] |
Del. Dean Jeffries [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-20 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 180) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 69) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 69) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Chapter 216, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-03-01 | House | Approved by Governor 3/1/19 |
2019-03-02 | House | Approved by Governor 3/1/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-02 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/1/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-02-26 | House | To Governor 2/26/19 |
2019-02-27 | House | To Governor 2/26/19 - House Journal |
2019-02-26 | Senate | To Governor 2/26/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-02-20 | House | House received Senate message |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 180) |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-20 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-19 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-02-18 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2019-02-05 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2019-02-05 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-05 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-02-04 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-02-04 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 69) |
2019-02-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-04 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-01 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-01-31 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-01-31 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-01-30 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2019-01-23 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2019-01-23 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-01-23 | House | To Health and Human Resources |
2019-01-23 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB434 (Similar To) 2019-01-25 - To Health and Human Resources
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 5C | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 5C | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 5C | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 5C | 12a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 5C | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 5C | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 5C | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 5C | 16 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
16 | 5C | 17 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
16 | 5C | 18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 5C | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 5C | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 5C | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 5C | 21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 5C | 22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 5C | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 5C | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 5C | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 5C | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 5C | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 5C | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 5C | 9a | Amended Code | Citation Text |