WV HB2612 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 217, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 217, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to authorize the secretary to propose rules related to the completion or updating of source water protection plans.
Title
Proposing rules related to the completion or updating of source water protection plans
Sponsors
Del. Jordan Hill [R] | Del. Stephen Wilson [R] | Del. Gary Howell [R] | Del. Ruth Rowan [R] |
Del. Barbara Fleischauer [D] | Del. Danielle Walker [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-23 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 212) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 70) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 70) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Chapter 217, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-03-07 | House | Approved by Governor 3/6/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-06 | House | Approved by Governor 3/6/19 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/6/16 - Senate Journal |
2019-02-28 | House | To Governor 2/28/19 |
2019-02-28 | House | To Governor 2/28/19 - House Journal |
2019-02-28 | Senate | To Governor 2/28/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-02-25 | House | House received Senate message |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 212) |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-23 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-22 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-02-21 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2019-02-05 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2019-02-05 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-05 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-02-04 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-02-04 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 70) |
2019-02-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-04 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-01 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-01-31 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-01-31 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-01-30 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2019-01-23 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2019-01-23 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-01-23 | House | To Health and Human Resources |
2019-01-23 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB430 (Similar To) 2019-01-25 - To Government Organization
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 1 | 9c | Amended Code | Citation Text |