WV HB2670 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-11 - Communicated to House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-11 - Communicated to House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to establish limits applicable to the award of damages for medical monitoring.Â
Title
Relating to damages for medical monitoring
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-09 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 476) (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Committee amendment adopted (Roll No. 467) (Y: 17 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-02-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 319) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Committee amendment adopted (Roll No. 467) (Y: 17 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-02-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 319) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Senate appoints conference committee: Trump, Takubo, Hardesty |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Senate refused to recede; requested conference (Voice vote) |
2019-03-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-09 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-09 | House | House refused to concur; requested Senate to recede (Voice) |
2019-03-09 | House | House received Senate message |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 476) |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-09 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Roll No. 467) |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-08 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate reconsidered action (voice vote) |
2019-03-08 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2019-02-27 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-02-27 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-27 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-02-26 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-02-26 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 319) |
2019-02-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-26 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-25 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-22 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-02-22 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-21 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2019-01-25 | House | To House Judiciary |
2019-01-25 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-01-25 | House | To Judiciary |
2019-01-25 | House | Filed for introduction |