WV HB2686 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-08 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-08 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to permitting the Supreme Court of Appeals of West Virginia to create a family drug court pilot program
Title
Relating to permitting the Supreme Court of Appeals of West Virginia to create a family drug court pilot program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 96) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-08 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-02-08 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-02-07 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-02-07 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 96) |
2019-02-07 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-07 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-06 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-05 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-02-05 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-04 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2019-01-28 | House | To House Judiciary |
2019-01-28 | House | Do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2019-01-28 | House | Originating in House Prevention and Treatment of Substance Abuse |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
62 | 15B | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 15B | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |