WV HB2694 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 13, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 13, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is relating to the state’s ability to regulate hemp production by submitting a plan to the Secretary of Agriculture; providing for continued production of industrial hemp without an approved plan for state regulation; providing for negligent violations of the state plan; providing for requirements to correct negligent violations; and, providing for revocation of an industrial hemp license for repeat negligent violations of a state plan.
Title
Relating to the state’s ability to regulate hemp
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-09 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 700) (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 479) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 286) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 479) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 286) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Chapter 13, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/27/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-27 | House | Approved by Governor 3/27/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/27/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/25/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-25 | House | To Governor 3/25/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/25/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-09 | House | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-09 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-09 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 700) |
2019-03-09 | House | House received Senate message |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 479) |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-09 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-08 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-03-07 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2019-02-26 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-02-26 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-26 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-02-25 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-02-25 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 286) |
2019-02-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-25 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-22 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-22 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-21 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-02-21 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-20 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2019-02-13 | House | To House Government Organization |
2019-02-13 | House | Do pass, but first to Government Organization |
2019-01-28 | House | To House Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2019-01-28 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-01-28 | House | To Agriculture and Natural Resources then Government Organization |
2019-01-28 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB629 (Similar To) 2019-02-21 - To Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 12E | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 12E | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 12E | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
19 | 12E | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
19 | 12E | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
19 | 12E | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
19 | 12E | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
19 | 12E | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
19 | 12E | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |