WV HB2716 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 181, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 181, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to clarify lighting and ventilation requirements for motorboats operating on waters of the state.
Title
Relating to vessel lighting and equipment requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-08 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 441) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 189) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 189) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Chapter 181, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/22/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/22/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-22 | House | Approved by Governor 3/22/2019 |
2019-03-21 | House | To Governor 3/21/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/21/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/21/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-08 | House | House received Senate message |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 441) |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-08 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-07 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-03-06 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2019-02-18 | Senate | To Natural Resources |
2019-02-18 | Senate | To Natural Resources |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-18 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-02-15 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-02-15 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-02-15 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 189) |
2019-02-15 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-15 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-14 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-02-14 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-14 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-13 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-02-13 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-12 | House | Do pass |
2019-02-05 | House | To House Government Organization |
2019-02-05 | House | Do pass, but first to Government Organization |
2019-01-29 | House | To House Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2019-01-29 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-01-29 | House | To Agriculture and Natural Resources then Government Organization |
2019-01-29 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 7 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |