WV HB2720 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-14 - To Health and Human Resources
Pending: Senate Health and Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-14 - To Health and Human Resources
Pending: Senate Health and Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to authorize supervising entities to authorize reserve deputies, ambulance crew members, firefighters, rescue squad members and emergency service personnel to carry firearms. It specifies the training required for them to be eligible to carry a firearm and allows them to be reimbursed for the cost of the training.
Title
Authorizing certain investigators and first responders to carry firearms
Sponsors
Del. David Pethtel [D] | Del. Chad Lovejoy [D] | Del. John Shott [R] | Del. Brent Boggs [D] |
Del. Anthony Paynter [R] | Del. Jason Harshbarger [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-13 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 137) (Y: 91 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2019-02-14 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources then Judiciary |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-14 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-02-13 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-02-13 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 137) |
2019-02-13 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-13 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-12 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-12 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-11 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-02-11 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-08 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2019-02-05 | House | To House Judiciary |
2019-02-05 | House | Do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2019-01-29 | House | To House Fire Departments and Emergency Medical Services |
2019-01-29 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-01-29 | House | To Fire Departments and Emergency Medical Services then Judiciary |
2019-01-29 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 4C | 24 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 3 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
6 | 1 | 3a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
7 | 15 | 19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
8 | 15 | 28 | New Code | See Bill Text |