WV HB2732 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2732
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-09 - On 2nd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-09 - On 2nd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to require an official declaration of war or an action to call forth the state militia by the United States Congress before members of the West Virginia National Guard may be released from state control to participate in active duty combat.
Title
Defend the Guard Act
Sponsors
Del. Pat McGeehan [R] | Del. Michael Angelucci [D] | Del. Sammi Brown [D] | Del. Jim Butler [R] |
Del. Mark Dean [R] | Del. John Doyle [D] | Del. Amanda Estep-Burton [D] | Del. William Anderson [R] |
Del. Rodney Pyles [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-25 - House - Motion to discharge committee adopted (Roll No. 277) (Y: 56 N: 41 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - Motion to take from table adopted (Roll No. 276) (Y: 53 N: 44 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - Motion to discharge committee tabled (Roll No. 252) (Y: 49 N: 47 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - Motion to take from table adopted (Roll No. 276) (Y: 53 N: 44 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - Motion to discharge committee tabled (Roll No. 252) (Y: 49 N: 47 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-09 | House | On 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2019-02-27 | House | From Special Calendar, 2nd reading, placed on House Calendar |
2019-02-26 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-25 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-02-25 | House | Immediate consideration |
2019-02-25 | House | Committee discharged as to H. B. 2732 |
2019-02-25 | House | Motion to discharge committee adopted (Roll No. 277) |
2019-02-25 | House | Motion to take from table adopted (Roll No. 276) |
2019-02-22 | House | Motion to discharge committee tabled (Roll No. 252) |
2019-02-15 | House | To House Judiciary |
2019-02-15 | House | Do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2019-01-30 | House | To House Veterans' Affairs and Homeland Security |
2019-01-30 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-01-30 | House | To Veterans' Affairs and Homeland Security then Judiciary |
2019-01-30 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2732 (Carry Over) 2019-03-09 - On 2nd reading, House Calendar