WV HB2754 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2754
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-30 - To House Banking and Insurance
Pending: House Banking & Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-30 - To House Banking and Insurance
Pending: House Banking & Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to establish certain requirements for dental insurance.
Title
Establishing certain requirements for dental insurance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-30 | House | To House Banking and Insurance |
2019-01-30 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-01-30 | House | To Banking and Insurance then Health and Human Resources |
2019-01-30 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2754 (Carry Over) 2019-01-30 - To House Banking and Insurance
HB2361 (Similar To) 2019-02-08 - To House Judiciary
SB262 (Similar To) 2019-01-11 - To Banking and Insurance
SB310 (Similar To) 2019-04-16 - Chapter 143, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
HB2361 (Similar To) 2019-02-08 - To House Judiciary
SB262 (Similar To) 2019-01-11 - To Banking and Insurance
SB310 (Similar To) 2019-04-16 - Chapter 143, Acts, Regular Session, 2019