WV HB2770 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 155, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 155, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to create the Fairness in Cost-Sharing Calculation Act by establishing cost sharing calculations for health plans and pharmacy benefits.
Title
Fairness in Cost-Sharing Calculation Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-09 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 712) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 505) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 287) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 505) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 287) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Chapter 155, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/27/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-27 | House | Approved by Governor 3/27/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/27/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/25/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-25 | House | To Governor 3/25/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/25/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-09 | House | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-09 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-09 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 712) |
2019-03-09 | House | House received Senate message |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 505) |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-09 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-08 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment |
2019-02-26 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2019-02-26 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-26 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-02-25 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-02-25 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-02-25 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 287) |
2019-02-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-25 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-22 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-22 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-21 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-02-21 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-20 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2019-02-15 | House | To House Judiciary |
2019-02-15 | House | Do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2019-01-30 | House | To House Banking and Insurance |
2019-01-30 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-01-30 | House | To Banking and Insurance then Judiciary |
2019-01-30 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB509 (Similar To) 2019-02-01 - To Banking and Insurance
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
33 | 15 | 4t | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 16 | 3ee | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 24 | 7t | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 25 | 8q | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 25A | 8t | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 52 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 52 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 52 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 52 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |