WV HB2815 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to increase the monetary value of goods or chattels stolen to be considered grand larceny.
Title
Raising the value of goods or chattels that are taken in a larceny to constitute grand larceny
Sponsors
Del. Brandon Steele [R] | Del. John Shott [R] | Del. Jeffrey Pack [R] | Del. Dianna Graves [R] |
Del. Joseph Canestraro [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 114) (Y: 90 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-11 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-02-11 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-11 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-02-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-02-08 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 114) |
2019-02-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-08 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-07 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-06 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-02-06 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-05 | House | Do pass |
2019-02-01 | House | To House Judiciary |
2019-02-01 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-01 | House | To Judiciary |
2019-02-01 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
61 | 3 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |