WV HB2827 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 65, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 65, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to remove the residency requirements for hiring deputy assessors.
Title
Removing the residency requirements for hiring deputy assessors
Sponsors
Del. Terrishie Sypolt [R] | Del. Chris Phillips [R] | Del. Dianna Graves [R] | Sen. Eric Nelson [R] |
Del. Rodney Pyles [D] | Del. Rodney Miller [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-28 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 293) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 289) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 289) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Chapter 65, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-03-19 | House | Approved by Governor 3/19/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/19/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/19/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-05 | House | To Governor 3/5/19 |
2019-03-05 | House | To Governor 3/5/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-05 | Senate | To Governor 3/5/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-02-28 | House | House received Senate message |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 293) |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-28 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-27 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Committee reference dispensed |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-26 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-02-25 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-02-25 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 289) |
2019-02-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-25 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-22 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-22 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-21 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-02-21 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-20 | House | Do pass |
2019-02-15 | House | To House Government Organization |
2019-02-15 | House | Do pass, but first to Government Organization |
2019-02-01 | House | To House Political Subdivisions |
2019-02-01 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-01 | House | To Political Subdivisions then Government Organization |
2019-02-01 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB565 (Similar To) 2019-02-25 - Referred to Rules on 2nd reading
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 2 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |