WV HB2828 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Vetoed on March 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Vetoed by Governor 3/27/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on March 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Vetoed by Governor 3/27/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to promoting investment in a Qualified Opportunity Zone
Title
Relating to Qualified Opportunity Zones
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-09 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 701) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 478) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 290) (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 478) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 290) (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | House | Vetoed by Governor 3/27/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | Vetoed by Governor 3/27/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor 3/27/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/25/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-25 | House | To Governor 3/25/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/25/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-09 | House | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-09 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-09 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 701) |
2019-03-09 | House | House received Senate message |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 478) |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-09 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Committee amendment as amended adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Amendments to committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Committee Amendment Reported |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-08 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-03-07 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2019-02-26 | Senate | To Finance |
2019-02-26 | Senate | To Finance |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-26 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-02-25 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-02-25 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 290) |
2019-02-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-25 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-22 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-22 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-21 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-02-21 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-20 | House | Do pass |
2019-02-01 | House | To House Finance |
2019-02-01 | House | Do pass, but first to Finance |
2019-02-01 | House | Originating in House Small Business, Entrepreneurship and Economic Development |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 21 | 12j | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 24 | 6b | New Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 15D | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 15D | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 15D | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 15D | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 15D | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 15D | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 15D | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 3 | 14e | New Code | See Bill Text |