WV HB2837 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-06 - To Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-06 - To Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to provide a mechanism to allow licensing of advance deposit wagering.
Title
Relating to the licensing of advance deposit wagering
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-25 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 292) (Y: 77 N: 20 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - Amendment adopted (Roll No 273) (Y: 55 N: 38 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - Amendment adopted (Roll No 273) (Y: 55 N: 38 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-06 | Senate | To Finance |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendments, but first to Finance |
2019-02-26 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-02-26 | Senate | To Judiciary then Finance |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-26 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-02-25 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-02-25 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 292) |
2019-02-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-25 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-22 | House | Amendment adopted (Roll No 273) |
2019-02-22 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-22 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-21 | House | Postponed on 2nd reading, Special Calendar, until 2/22/19 |
2019-02-21 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-20 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-02-20 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-19 | House | 2nd reference dispensed |
2019-02-19 | House | Do pass, but first to Finance |
2019-02-04 | House | To House Judiciary |
2019-02-04 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-04 | House | To Judiciary then Finance |
2019-02-04 | House | Filed for introduction |