WV HB2848 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 219, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 219, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to make amendments to the West Virginia ABLE Act and add a reduction in federal adjusted gross income for West Virginia personal income taxes. The bill adds and clarifies definitions to conform to federal law; adds an attorney in fact and a parent to the persons authorized to create or manage West Virginia ABLE Act accounts as permitted by federal law; amends the age of eligible individuals to conform to federal law; clarifies that a guardian may manage an ABLE account regardless of the amount of a designated beneficiary’s assets and that the Department of Health and Human Resources may not manage an ABLE account; adds an FEIN to the application requirements; authorizing the minimum account value to be the value established by the state of the program manager contracting with the Treasurer; clarifies that moneys in a West Virginia ABLE Act account or from a qualified withdrawal are to be disregarded when determining eligibility for or the amount of public assistance unless required by federal law, are not subject to claims of the Department of Health and Human Resources unless required by federal law, and on the death of a designed beneficiary shall be transferred to the estate of the designated beneficiary unless prohibited by federal law; and authorizes contributions to West Virginia ABLE Act accounts to be subtracted from federal adjusted gross income for purposes of West Virginia personal income taxes and the recapture of the amounts subtracted if used for purposes other than a qualified disability expense. In addition, the bill makes various technical revisions.
Title
Relating to the West Virginia ABLE Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-01 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 310) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 309) (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 182) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 309) (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 182) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Chapter 219, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/27/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-27 | House | Approved by Governor 3/27/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/27/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-08 | Senate | To Governor 3/8/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-08 | House | To Governor 3/8/19 |
2019-03-08 | House | To Governor 3/8/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-02 | House | House received Senate message |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 310) |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 309) |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-01 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-02-28 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2019-02-15 | Senate | To Finance |
2019-02-15 | Senate | To Finance |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-15 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-02-14 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-02-14 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 182) |
2019-02-14 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-14 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-13 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-13 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-12 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-02-12 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-11 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2019-02-04 | House | To House Finance |
2019-02-04 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-04 | House | To Finance |
2019-02-04 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 21 | 12i | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 48 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 48 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |